KY SB117 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-10 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-10 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 141 to provide a nonrefundable credit against the income tax imposed under KRS 141.020 or 141.040, and the limited liability entity tax imposed under KRS 141.0401, establish program tax credit cap; amend KRS 141.0205 to establish the order in which the credit may be taken; EFFECTIVE for tax periods beginning after December 31, 2012 and before January 1, 2026.
Title
AN ACT relating to tax credits for the purchase of qualified plug-in electric drive vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-10 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-02-08 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB117.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB117/bill.doc |