KY SB115 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - returned to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - returned to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 231 to express the findings of the General Assembly relating to adult-oriented businesses and the need for regulation; define terms; establish distance parameters for the location of adult-oriented businesses in proximity to identified entities and locations; establish transition provisions for existing businesses; affirm the authority of local governmental units to supplement regulation of adult-oriented businesses.
Title
AN ACT relating to adult performances.
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Tichenor [R] | Sen. Gex Williams [R] | Sen. Gary Boswell [R] | Sen. Adrienne Southworth [R] |
Sen. Phillip Wheeler [R] | Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa2 scta1 RSN# 2587 (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-16 | House | 1st reading |
2023-03-16 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-13 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-03-13 | House | received in House |
2023-03-10 | Senate | passed 26 -6 -1 with Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (2) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | floor amendment defeated Floor Amendments (1) and (3) |
2023-03-10 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | floor amendments (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2023-03-08 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2023-02-10 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-02-10 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Children and Minors
Civil Actions
Corrections Impact
Local Mandate
Obscenity and Pornography
Public Safety
Civil Actions
Corrections Impact
Local Mandate
Obscenity and Pornography
Public Safety