KY SB114 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 21)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 21)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 281A.010 so that the definition of "hazardous materials" conforms with the federal definition; amend KRS 189.560 to include federal offenses listed in 49 C.F.R. sec. 383.51(d) as grounds for disqualification of a CDL holder for railroad crossing offenses; amend KRS 281A.170 to require the Transportation Cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations relating to CDL standardized operating restrictions; amend KRS 189.990 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to commercial driver's licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 21) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-11 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-03-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 |
2013-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-25 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2013-02-21 | House | received in House |
2013-02-20 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 20, 2013 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2013-02-11 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |