KY SB114 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 134)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 134)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of Subtitle 17A of KRS Chapter 304 to define "step therapy," "fail-first protocol," and "override of the restriction"; establish step therapy or fail-first protocol limitations; require override of restriction within 48 hours of request if based on sound clinical evidence that the preferred treatment has been ineffective or based on sound clinical evidence or medical and scientific evidence that the preferred treatment will be ineffective for the insured or will cause or will likely cause an adverse reaction to the insured.
Title
AN ACT relating to step therapy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 134) | |
2012-03-30 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-30 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2012-03-29 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-28 | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 | |
2012-03-28 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 28, 2012 | |
2012-03-27 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill | |
2012-03-26 | posted in committee | |
2012-03-26 | returned to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2012-03-26 | 1st reading | |
2012-03-26 | taken from Health & Welfare (H) | |
2012-03-26 | posting waived | |
2012-02-21 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2012-02-16 | received in House | |
2012-02-15 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-14 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 15, 2012 | |
2012-02-08 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill | |
2012-02-07 | recommitted to Health & Welfare (S) | |
2012-02-02 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-01 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-01-26 | to Health & Welfare (S) | |
2012-01-24 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB114.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB114/bill.doc |