KY SB114 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of Subtitle 17A of KRS Chapter 304 to authorize health benefit plans to offer incentives or rewards to members who participate in a voluntary wellness or health improvement program; the authorized incentives and rewards shall not be deemed a violation of the rebate prohibition contained in KRS 304.12-090 and 304.12.010; if a health plan member is unable to participate in a wellness or health improvement programs due to a medical condition, verification may be required; and, an insurer shall not be prohibited from offering incentives or rewards to members participating in a wellness or health improvement program if otherwise allowed by state or federal.
Title
AN ACT relating to health benefit plan wellness programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | signed by Governor | |
2011-03-04 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-03-04 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-03 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2011-03-03 | received in Senate | |
2011-03-03 | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 | |
2011-03-02 | floor amendments (5-title) and (6) filed | |
2011-03-01 | floor amendment (3) withdrawn | |
2011-03-01 | floor amendments (2-title) (3) and (4-title) filed | |
2011-02-28 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2011-02-25 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2011-02-24 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 25, 2011 | |
2011-02-24 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-23 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-22 | posting waived | |
2011-02-22 | to Banking & Insurance (H) | |
2011-02-18 | received in House | |
2011-02-17 | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-17 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 17, 2011 | |
2011-02-16 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-15 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-09 | to Banking & Insurance (S) | |
2011-02-07 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB114.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB114/bill.doc |