KY SB114 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 69)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 69)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 162, notwithstanding any other statute or administrative regulation to the contrary, to permit any nonprofit finance corporation formed under KRS 162.385 to lease land from any government entity or agency for the purposes of constructing a school building site; the lease shall be for 1 year but may be extended from year to year for a minimum of 50 years.
Title
AN ACT relating to school facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Tapp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 69) | |
2010-03-26 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-03-26 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2010-03-26 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-25 | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 | |
2010-03-24 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 25, 2010 | |
2010-03-24 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-23 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-03-18 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-26 | to Education (H) | |
2010-02-25 | received in House | |
2010-02-24 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with floor amendment (1) | |
2010-02-22 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 24, 2010 | |
2010-02-18 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2010-02-12 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-11 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-02-02 | to Education (S) | |
2010-01-28 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB114.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB114/bill.doc |