KY SB113 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 235)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 235)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 317A.010 to change the definition from "blow dry services" to "shampoo and style services" and define "limited stylist"; amend KRS 317A.050 to provide for an instructor training eligibility certificate and to reduce the number of hours of instruction required for a shampoo and style license from 450 to 300; revise the terminology to conform; specify requirements for a temporary event services permit and remove residency requirement; amend KRS 317A.090 to remove restriction on when instructional hours may be given; amend KRS 317A.155 to allow stylists to operate outside of an establishment licensed by the board under certain conditions; require permission of the person or legal representative of the person receiving services.
Title
AN ACT relating to beauty services.
Sponsors
Sen. Alice Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2350 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 493 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2131 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 493 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2131 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 235) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-04-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-04-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | passed 35-0-1 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-30 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | returned to Rules |
2022-03-29 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-24 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-21 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H) |
2022-03-16 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-16 | House | received in House |
2022-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 16, 2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-27 | Senate | to Licensing & Occupations (S) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | introduced in Senate |