KY SB112 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 187)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to require the cabinet to regulate telehealth; set requirements for the delivery of telehealth services to Medicaid recipients; require equivalent reimbursement for telehealth services; require provision of coverage and reimbursement for telehealth; prohibit the cabinet from requiring providers to be physically present with a recipient; prohibit prior authorization, medical review, or administrative clearance if not required for the in-person service; prohibit demonstration of necessity; prohibit requiring providers to be part of a telehealth network; specify that Medicaid shall not be required to provide coverage for services that are not medically necessary or pay for transmission costs; amend KRS 205.510 to define terms; amend KRS 205.559 to add telehealth; amend 304.17A-005 to redefine "telehealth"; amend KRS 304.17A-138 to require health benefit plan coverage of telehealth to the same extent as though provided in person; prohibit health benefit plans from requiring providers to be physically present with a patient; prohibit prior authorization, medical review, or administrative clearance if not required for the in-person service; prohibit demonstration of necessity; prohibit requiring providers to be part of the telehealth network or subject to Telehealth Board oversight; specify that health benefit plans shall not be required to provide coverage for services that are not medically necessary or pay for transmission costs; amend KRS 342.315 to conform; amend KRS 18A.225 to require any fully insured health benefit plans or self-insured plans issued or renewed after July 1, 2019, to public employees to comply with KRS 304.17A-138; repeal KRS 194A.125; EFFECTIVE July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to telehealth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 503 (Y: 65 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SFA 2, SFA 3 RSN# 465 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 465 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Adopt SFA 3 TO SB112 W/ SCS 1 RSN# 464 (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26Senatesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 187)
2018-04-14Senatedelivered to Governor
2018-04-14Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-14Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-14Senatereceived in Senate
2018-04-14House3rd reading, passed 65-20
2018-03-22Houseplaced in the Regular Orders of the Day
2018-03-22Housetaken from Rules
2018-03-21Housefloor amendments (1) and (2) filed
2018-03-21Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill
2018-03-20Housereturned to Health and Family Services (H)
2018-03-20House1st reading
2018-03-20Housetaken from Health and Family Services (H)
2018-03-13Houseposted in committee
2018-03-01Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2018-02-27Housereceived in House
2018-02-26Senatepassed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) & floor amendments (2) and (3)
2018-02-26Senatefloor amendment (1) withdrawn
2018-02-26Senate3rd reading
2018-02-26Senateplaced in the Orders of the Day for Monday, February 26
2018-02-26Senatetaken from the Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 27
2018-02-23Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 27, 2018
2018-02-21Senatefloor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-02-20Senatefloor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-02-15Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-02-15Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-14Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-01-29Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2018-01-26Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback