KY SB111 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 36)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 36)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 65.7047 to make permissive the use of an independent consultant or financial advisor in tax increment financing for local governments; establish criteria for the report of any consultant or advisor employed to analyze the project and development area data; provide for payment of consultant or advisor, if employed.
Title
AN ACT relating to local government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2179 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 336 (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 sfta2 RSN# 2014 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 336 (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 sfta2 RSN# 2014 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 36) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-22 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-22 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-22 | Senate | passed 35-3 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-18 | House | 3rd reading, passed 84-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-17 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 18, 2022 |
2022-03-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-03-08 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2022-02-11 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-11 | House | received in House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-3 with Floor Amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2022-02-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 09, 2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-02 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2022-02-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-27 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | introduced in Senate |