KY SB11 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 278.600 to require that nuclear power facilities have a plan for the storage of nuclear waste rather than a means of permanent disposal and to add definitions of "storage," "low-level nuclear waste," and "mixed nuclear waste"; amend KRS 278.610 to allow certification if the facility and its plans for waste storage are approved by the Nuclear Regulatory Commission; eliminate the requirement that the facility have a plan for disposal of high-level nuclear waste; eliminate the requirement that cost of waste disposal be known; eliminate the requirement that the facility have adequate capacity to contain waste; give the Public Service Commission authority to hire a consultant to perform duties relating to nuclear facility certification; prohibit construction of low-level nuclear waste disposal sites in Kentucky except as provided in KRS 211.852; direct the Energy and Environment Cabinet to review regulations required for permitting nuclear facilities and report to LRC; repeal KRS 278.605, relating to construction of nuclear power facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to nuclear power.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-15Senatedelivered to Governor
2017-03-15Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2017-03-15Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2017-03-15Senatereceived in Senate
2017-03-15House3rd reading, passed 65-28
2017-03-08Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 14, 2017
2017-03-08House2nd reading, to Rules
2017-03-07Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2017-03-06Houseposted in committee
2017-03-03Houseto Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H)
2017-03-02Housereceived in House
2017-03-01Senate3rd reading, passed 27-8 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1)
2017-03-01Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 1, 2017
2017-02-21Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2017-02-16Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2017-02-15Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2017-01-07Senateto Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2017-01-03Senateintroduced in Senate
2016-09-19SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback