KY SB11 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-04 - to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-04 - to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 205 to establish a civil mechanism for the recovery of false or fraudulent claims made against the Commonwealth's Medicaid System, including provisions increasing damages and civil penalties against wrongdoers, delineating mandatory and discretionary activities of the Attorney General, authorizing private litigants to bring claims in the name of the state against wrongdoers, establishing procedural mechanisms for handling civil actions of this type in the courts, prohibiting retaliation against employees who assist in suits of this type, and establishing time limitations for the filing of these suits.
Title
AN ACT relating to false claims.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-04 | to Judiciary (H) | |
2011-02-02 | received in House | |
2011-01-07 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2011-01-07 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 7, 2011 | |
2011-01-06 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute | |
2011-01-05 | returned to Judiciary (S) | |
2011-01-05 | 2nd reading | |
2011-01-05 | taken from Judiciary (S) | |
2011-01-04 | returned to Judiciary (S) | |
2011-01-04 | 1st reading | |
2011-01-04 | taken from Judiciary (S) | |
2011-01-04 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB11.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB11/bill.doc |