KY SB109 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-01 - returned to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-01 - returned to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.7881 to permit high school seniors beginning with the 2014-2015 academic year, and high school juniors and seniors beginning with the 2015-2016 academic year, to use their KEES awards to pay for dual credit courses; require that the funds they would have received as eligible postsecondary students be reduced proportionally over a four-, or in some cases, five-year period by an amount equal to the amount used for dual credit; amend KRS 164.7885 to conform; designate the expenditures as necessary governmental expenses if KEES funds appropriated for fiscal years 2015 and 2016 are not adequate.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Educational Excellence Scholarship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-01 | House | returned to Education (H) |
2013-03-01 | House | 1st reading |
2013-03-01 | House | taken from Education (H) |
2013-02-25 | House | to Education (H) |
2013-02-21 | House | received in House |
2013-02-20 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 20, 2013 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-11 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SB109.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SB109/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SB109/vote_history.pdf |