KY SB103 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-14 - posted in committee
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-14 - posted in committee
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 311.710 to 311.820 to require an ultrasound prior to an abortion; amend KRS 311.990 to provide a criminal penalty.
Title
AN ACT relating to full disclosure in public safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Bowen [R] | Sen. Jimmy Higdon [R] | Sen. Damon Thayer [R] | Sen. Jack Westwood [R] |
Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | posted in committee | |
2012-02-21 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2012-02-15 | received in House | |
2012-02-14 | 3rd reading, passed 32-4 with floor amendment (1) | |
2012-02-14 | returned to the Orders of the Day | |
2012-02-14 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2012-02-13 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2012-02-10 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2012-02-09 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2012-02-08 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2012-02-07 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 8, 2012 | |
2012-01-27 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2012-01-27 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-01-26 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2012-01-19 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | |
2012-01-18 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB103.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB103/bill.doc |