KY SB1 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - returned to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 61 to prohibit law enforcement agencies, law enforcement officials, employees of a law enforcement agency or public agencies, public officials, or employees of a public agency or public institution operating under KRS Chapter 164 from enacting, adopting, or otherwise enforcing any sanctuary policy relating to immigration; require law enforcement officials, representatives, agents, and employees of law enforcement agencies, public officials, representatives, agents, and employees of public agencies to use their best efforts, considering available resources, to support the enforcement of federal immigration law; exempt school districts, district boards of education, public charter schools, and employees and contractors from the provisions of the section; provide that any immigration sanctuary policy adopted prior to or after the effective date of the Act in violation of Section 1 of the Act is invalid, void, and unenforceable; allow the Governor, Attorney General, or any state constitutional officer to bring an action for enforcement through injunctive action; establish a short title .

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to federal immigration cooperation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1185 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18Housereturned to Judiciary (H)
2020-03-18House2nd reading
2020-03-18Housetaken from Judiciary (H)
2020-03-17Housereturned to Judiciary (H)
2020-03-17House1st reading
2020-03-17Housetaken from Judiciary (H)
2020-03-17Housefloor amendments (1) and (2) filed
2020-02-10Houseposted in committee
2020-02-07Houseto Judiciary (H)
2020-02-05Housereceived in House
2020-02-04Senatepassed 28-10 with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-02-04Senatefloor amendment (2) defeated
2020-02-04Senatefloor amendment (1) withdrawn
2020-02-04Senate3rd reading
2020-02-03Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 4, 2020
2020-01-30Senatefloor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-01-30Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-01-14Senatefloor amendment (1) filed
2020-01-13Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2020-01-13Senate2nd reading
2020-01-13Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2020-01-10Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2020-01-10Senate1st reading
2020-01-10Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2020-01-08Senateto Judiciary (S)
2020-01-07Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback