KY SB1 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-11 - to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
Pending: House Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-11 - to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
Pending: House Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of the Constitution of Kentucky to permit the General Assembly by general law to prohibit the adoption of administrative regulations that it has found to be deficient.
Title
AN ACT proposing to amend Section 29 of the Constitution of Kentucky relating to administrative regulations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2014-02-06 | House | received in House |
2014-02-06 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 24-14 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2014-02-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 5, 2014 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-01-29 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |