KY SB1 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-05 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 131)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-05 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 131)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [MS Word]
Summary
Establish KRS Chapter 117A and create new sections thereof to adopt the Uniform Military and Overseas Voters Act (UMOVA); define terms; provide that certain military and overseas voters are "covered voters" for purposes of the Act; provide that the Act applies to elections for federal, state, and local offices and ballot measures; provide that the Secretary of State shall develop an electronic transmission system through which a covered voter may apply for and receive absentee ballots and other elections information; allow the Secretary of State to delegate duties under KRS Chapter 117A to the State Board of Elections; provide that overseas voters shall be assigned to the voting precinct of the last place of residence in the state, or if no longer valid, to an assigned address in the same precinct and to give the Secretary of State authority to promulgate administrative regulations covering the procedures for assigning an address; provide that a covered voter may register to vote using the federal postcard application or its electronic equivalent or the declaration accompanying a federal write-in absentee ballot; provide that a covered voter may apply for a specified ballot using either the regular absentee ballot application or the federal postcard application or its electronic equivalent or the declaration accompanying a federal write-in absentee ballot; provide that an application for a specified ballot is timely if received by the close of business hours seven days before the election; provide time periods for ballots to be transmitted to covered voters; provide time periods for ballots to be received to be valid; provide that a covered voter may use a federal write-in absentee ballot for all offices and ballot measures for covered elections; provide that all valid ballots cast in accordance with provisions be counted if delivered by the end of business on the day before the vote totals are certified and that a ballot may not be rejected for a late or missing postmark if the voter has declared it was timely submitted; provide that all specified ballots be accompanied by a signed declaration that a material misstatement of fact may be grounds for a conviction of perjury; provide that the Secretary of State shall implement an electronic system to allow covered voters to determine if ballot application and ballot have been received and accepted; provide procedures for collecting and handling electronic-mail addresses from covered voters; provide that sample ballots shall be prepared at least 50 days before an election that includes all ballot measures and offices that are expected to be on the ballot; provide that sample ballots shall be posted on Internet Web sites and provided to requesting voters; provide that failure to satisfy a nonsubstantive requirement does not invalidate a document submitted under the chapter, that notarization and authentication are not required, and that if intention of the voter is discernible then the ballot must be accepted as a valid vote; provide that a court may issue an injunction or grant other equitable relief to ensure compliance with the chapter; provide that the Act should be construed with consideration of need to promote uniformity of the law among states that enact the Act; provide that KRS Chapter 117A modifies the federal Act governing electronic signatures to extent permitted and governs if inconsistent with other election laws; amend KRS 117.079, 117.085, and 117.086 to conform and to establish that uniformed-service voters and overseas voters are permitted to submit absentee ballot applications and ballots by facsimile, or by an electronic transmission system; Create a Military and Overseas Voting Assistance Task Force to study the election laws and absentee ballot procedures of the Commonwealth relating to military and overseas voters; direct task force to submit report to the Legislative Research Commission by November 27, 2013; Effective dates, delayed.
Title
AN ACT relating to elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-05 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 131) |
2013-03-26 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-26 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Bill passed 38-0 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2013-03-26 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Report |
2013-03-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-03-26 | House | Bill passed 91-0 |
2013-03-26 | House | Free Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2013-03-26 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Report |
2013-03-26 | House | Free Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2013-03-26 | House | Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2013-03-26 | House | Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate |
2013-03-26 | House | Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2013-03-12 | House | Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2013-03-12 | House | House refused to recede from Committee Substitute |
2013-03-12 | House | posted for passage for receding from House Committee Substitute |
2013-03-12 | House | received in House |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in House Committee Substitute |
2013-03-12 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute |
2013-03-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-03-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 57-42 with Committee Substitute |
2013-03-11 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day for Monday, March 11, 2013 |
2013-03-11 | House | taken from Rules |
2013-03-07 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2013-03-07 | House | floor amendments (3) (4) and (5) filed to Committee Substitute |
2013-03-06 | House | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) filed |
2013-03-05 | House | posting waived |
2013-03-05 | House | reassigned to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2013-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-28 | House | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2013-02-28 | House | 2nd reading |
2013-02-28 | House | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | posting waived |
2013-02-27 | House | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | 1st reading |
2013-02-27 | House | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2013-02-26 | House | received in House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2013-02-26 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2013-02-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for for Tuesday, February 26, 2013 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2013-02-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | 1st reading |
2013-02-20 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |