KY HJR63 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Designate the Honor and Remember Flag as an emblem of the service and sacrifice by the brave men and women of the United States Armed Forces who have given their lives in the line of duty.
Title
Designate the Honor and Remember Flag as an emblem of the service and sacrifice by the brave men and women of the United States Armed Forces who have given their lives in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Thompson [D] | Rep. Chris Harris [D] | Rep. Cluster Howard [D] | Rep. Dean Schamore [D] |
Rep. Fitz Steele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-19 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2015-02-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-13 | House | 3rd reading, adopted 91-0 |
2015-02-12 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2015-02-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 13, 2015 |
2015-02-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-09 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-05 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | introduced in House |