KY HJR52 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-26 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-26 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Commend the Southeastern Kentucky Shawnee for their efforts to help their elderly and youth and to recognize their work to preserve their native language and heritage, which does not include gambling and casinos.
Title
Commend the Southeastern Kentucky Shawnee for their efforts to help their elderly and youth and to recognize their work to preserve their native language and heritage, which does not include gambling and casinos.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-24 | House | 3rd reading, adopted 99-0 |
2014-03-21 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 24, 2014 |
2014-03-21 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-03-11 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-21 | House | to State Government (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HJ52.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HJ52/bill.doc |