KY HJR33 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor(Acts, ch. 52)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor(Acts, ch. 52)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Recommend that the Cabinet for Health and Family Services and the Administrative Office of the Courts create a pilot Working Interdisciplinary Networks of Guardianship Stakeholders, or WINGS, to examine how Kentucky's adult guardianship is working and to identify needed changes.
Title
Recommend that the Cabinet for Health and Family Services and the Administrative Office of the Courts create a pilot Working Interdisciplinary Networks of Guardianship Stakeholders, or WINGS, to examine how Kentucky's adult guardianship is working and to identify needed changes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | signed by Governor(Acts, ch. 52) |
2018-03-27 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-22 | House | received in House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-06 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-02-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-0 |
2018-02-01 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 2, 2018 |
2018-02-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-31 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-01-16 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-09 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2018-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HJR33.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HJ33/bill.pdf |