KY HCR90 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 180)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 180)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Urge Congress to designate the southern portion of the Edward T. Breathitt Pennyrile Parkway as Interstate 169.
Title
Urge Congress to designate the southern portion of the Edward T. Breathitt Pennyrile Parkway as Interstate 169.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 180) |
2017-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-30 | House | received in House |
2017-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-03-07 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-03 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 |
2017-03-02 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2017-03-01 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 2, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-28 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-16 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2017-02-15 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HCR90.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/HC90/bill.pdf |