KY HCR48 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 179)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 179)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Urge the United States Food and Drug Administration to withdraw its proposed standard for NNN levels on ingredients and constituents in smokeless tobacco products.
Title
Urge the United States Food and Drug Administration to withdraw its proposed standard for NNN levels on ingredients and constituents in smokeless tobacco products.
Sponsors
Rep. Walker Thomas [R] | Rep. Lynn Bechler [R] | Rep. Myron Dossett [R] | Rep. Gary Herald [R] |
Rep. Jason Petrie [R] | Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 179) |
2017-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-30 | House | received in House |
2017-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-6 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2017-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-28 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 69-13 |
2017-02-23 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 27, 2017 |
2017-02-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-21 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-13 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2017-02-08 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HCR48.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/HC48/bill.pdf |