KY HCR40 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Declare it fitting and proper that public safety telecommunicators be included as a protective service occupation under the federal Standard Occupational Classification system; urge Congress to enact the Supporting Accurate Views of Emergency Services Acts of 2019.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging Congress to pass the Supporting Accurate Views of Emergency Services Act of 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 47 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-01-29 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-0 |
2020-01-28 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 29, 2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-17 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-16 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2020-01-14 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Cities
Communications
Counties
Emergency Medical Services
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Local Government
Occupations and Professions
Police, City and County
Police, State
Public Officers and Employees
Public Protection
Public Safety
Safety
Sheriffs
State Employees
Telecommunications
Communications
Counties
Emergency Medical Services
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Local Government
Occupations and Professions
Police, City and County
Police, State
Public Officers and Employees
Public Protection
Public Safety
Safety
Sheriffs
State Employees
Telecommunications