KY HCR29 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the Legislative Research Commission to establish a Timber Theft and Trespass Reduction Task Force; provide that the purpose of the task force is to study issues regarding timber theft and trespass and to develop consensus recommendations to address those issues; name the membership of the task force; require the task force to meet three times before submitting its final report; require its final report to be submitted to the Legislative Research Commission by November 30, 2016; and provide that the Legislative Research Commission has authority to alternatively assign the issues identified in the Resolution to interim joint committees or subcommittees thereof.
Title
Direct the Legislative Research Commission to establish a Timber Theft and Trespass Reduction Task Force; provide that the purpose of the task force is to study issues regarding timber theft and trespass and to develop consensus recommendations to address those issues; name the membership of the task force; require the task force to meet three times before submitting its final report; require its final report to be submitted to the Legislative Research Commission by November 30, 2016; and provide that the Legislative Research Commission has authority to alternatively assign the issues identified in the Resolution to interim joint committees or subcommittees thereof.
Sponsors
Rep. Leslie Combs [D] | Rep. Mitchel Denham [D] | Rep. Cluster Howard [D] | Rep. Brad Montell [R] |
Rep. Rick Nelson [D] | Rep. David Osborne [R] | Rep. Steven Riggs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-02-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2016-02-08 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 10 |
2016-02-05 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-04 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-02 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-14 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-07 | House | to Natural Resources & Environment (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HCR29.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HC29/bill.pdf |