KY HCR210 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 118)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 118)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Recognize the celebration of the Kentucky New State Capitol centennial; urge Kentuckians, and guests to Kentucky, to share stories about life, work, or visits to the Capitol through county cooperative extension offices; encourage participation in the Capitol Centennial celebration gala on June 4, 2010; encourage all citizens and visitors from around the nation to attend the Capitol Centennial celebration on Saturday, June 5, 2010.
Title
Recognize the celebration of the Kentucky New State Capitol centennial; urge Kentuckians, and guests to Kentucky, to share stories about life, work, or visits to the Capitol through county cooperative extension offices; encourage participation in the Capitol Centennial celebration gala on June 4, 2010; encourage all citizens and visitors from around the nation to attend the Capitol Centennial celebration on Saturday, June 5, 2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 118) | |
2010-04-01 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-04-01 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2010-04-01 | received in House | |
2010-03-29 | 3rd reading, adopted 38-0 | |
2010-03-29 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 29, 2010 | |
2010-03-26 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-25 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-03-24 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-03-22 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-22 | 3rd reading, adopted 98-0 | |
2010-03-15 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 16, 2010 | |
2010-03-12 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-11 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | posting waived | |
2010-03-09 | reassigned to Economic Development (H) | |
2010-03-04 | to Tourism Development & Energy (H) | |
2010-03-02 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HC210.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HC210/bill.doc |