KY HCR207 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 119)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 119)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Urge the United States Department of Agriculture to evaluate the efficiency of the formula used to establish milk prices paid to farmers and determine if that formula puts Kentucky dairy farmers at a competitive disadvantage.
Title
Urge the United States Department of Agriculture to evaluate the efficiency of the formula used to establish milk prices paid to farmers and determine if that formula puts Kentucky dairy farmers at a competitive disadvantage.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Bell [D] | Rep. James Comer [R] | Rep. Mitchel Denham [D] | Rep. Martha King [D] |
Rep. Thomas McKee [D] | Rep. Wilson Stone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 119) | |
2010-04-01 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-04-01 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2010-04-01 | received in House | |
2010-03-29 | 3rd reading, adopted 38-0 | |
2010-03-29 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 29, 2010 | |
2010-03-25 | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill | |
2010-03-23 | returned to Agriculture (S) | |
2010-03-23 | 2nd reading | |
2010-03-23 | taken from committee | |
2010-03-17 | returned to Agriculture (S) | |
2010-03-17 | 1st reading | |
2010-03-17 | taken from committee | |
2010-03-16 | to Agriculture (S) | |
2010-03-15 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-12 | 3rd reading, adopted 83-0 | |
2010-03-11 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 12, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-10 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-03-08 | posted in committee | |
2010-03-02 | to Agriculture & Small Business (H) | |
2010-03-01 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HC207.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HC207/bill.doc |