KY HCR15 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 17)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 17)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Designate March 2010 as Kidney Cancer Awareness Month in Kentucky.
Title
Designate March 2010 as Kidney Cancer Awareness Month in Kentucky.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 17) | |
2010-03-10 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-03-10 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2010-03-10 | received in House | |
2010-03-09 | 3rd reading, adopted 37-0 | |
2010-03-08 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2010-03-04 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 8, 2010 | |
2010-02-25 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-24 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-01-25 | to Health & Welfare (S) | |
2010-01-22 | received in Senate | |
2010-01-21 | 3rd reading, adopted 99-0 | |
2010-01-15 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 21, 2010 | |
2010-01-15 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-01-14 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-01-12 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-05 | to State Government (H) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HC15.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HC15/bill.doc |