KY HCR136 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - received in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - received in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Establish a Timber Theft and Trespass Reduction Task Force; provide that the purpose of the task force is to study issues regarding timber theft and trespass and to develop consensus recommendations to address those issues; name the membership of the task force; require the task force to meet three times before submitting its final report; require its final report to be submitted to the Legislative Research Commission by December 1, 2011; and provide that the Legislative Research Commission has authority to alternatively assign the issues identified in the Resolution to interim joint committees or subcommittees thereof.
Title
Establish a Timber Theft and Trespass Reduction Task Force; provide that the purpose of the task force is to study issues regarding timber theft and trespass and to develop consensus recommendations to address those issues; name the membership of the task force; require the task force to meet three times before submitting its final report; require its final report to be submitted to the Legislative Research Commission by December 1, 2011; and provide that the Legislative Research Commission has authority to alternatively assign the issues identified in the Resolution to interim joint committees or subcommittees thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | received in Senate | |
2011-03-01 | 3rd reading, adopted 99-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-28 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 1, 2011 | |
2011-02-25 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-24 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-16 | posting waived | |
2011-02-15 | to Natural Resources & Environment (H) | |
2011-02-14 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HC136.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HC136/bill.doc |