KY HCR114 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]

Summary

Urge greater awareness of the need to use specially designed medical alert bands by persons using blood thinners to prevent fatal head injuries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urge greater awareness of the need to use specially designed medical alert bands by persons using blood thinners to prevent fatal head injuries.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-16 signed by Governor
2011-03-04 delivered to Governor
2011-03-04 enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2011-03-04 received in House
2011-03-04 3rd reading, adopted 37-0
2011-03-03 posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 4, 2011
2011-03-03 reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill
2011-02-28 to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2011-02-24 received in Senate
2011-02-23 3rd reading, adopted 99-0
2011-02-22 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 23, 2011
2011-02-18 2nd reading, to Rules
2011-02-17 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2011-02-15 posted in committee
2011-02-14 to Health & Welfare (H)
2011-02-10 introduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback