KY HB97 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 2 to designate the first Saturday of October of each year as "First Responder Recognition Day"; require the Governor to proclaim the date each year and require state flags to be lowered on state public buildings from sun-up to sun-down on that day.
Title
AN ACT relating to First Responder Recognition Day.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Massey [R] | Rep. Chris Freeland [R] | Rep. Regina Huff [R] | Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] |
Rep. Rob Rothenburger [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 100 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2020-02-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 11, 2020 |
2020-02-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to State Government (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-11-15 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Governor
Holidays
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Police, State
Governor
Holidays
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Police, State