KY HB97 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 121.180(7) to move the date for filing a supplemental annual report from December 1 to December 31.
Title
AN ACT relating to campaign finance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 504 (Y: 72 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 712 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SFA 1, SCTA 1 RSN# 544 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 544 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 25 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 712 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SFA 1, SCTA 1 RSN# 544 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 544 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 25 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | vetoed |
2018-04-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-04-14 | House | Bill passed 72-16 |
2018-04-14 | House | Free Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2018-04-14 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference |
2018-04-14 | House | taken from Rules |
2018-04-13 | House | Free Conference Committee report filed in House |
2018-04-13 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-04-13 | House | received in House |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Bill passed 36-2 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2018-04-13 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report for Friday, April 13, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report filed in Senate |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Free Conference Committee appointed in Senate |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Free Conference Committee appointed in House |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Conference Committee report filed in House |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Conference Committee report filed in Senate |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in Senate |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from committee amendment (1-title) Committee Substitute (1) floor amendment (1) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | posted for passage for receding from Senate for Thursday, March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-21 | House | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title), and floor amendment (1) |
2018-03-21 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title), and floor amendment (1) |
2018-03-21 | House | taken from Rules |
2018-03-19 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-03-19 | House | received in House |
2018-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-4 with Committee Substitute (1) floor amendment (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 16, 2018 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-14 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2018-03-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute & committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-01-17 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 |
2018-01-16 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 17, 2018 |
2018-01-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-01-04 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-04 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2018-01-02 | House | introduced in House |