KY HB97 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 123)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 123)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 118.176 to add candidates for special elections to current definitions; amend KRS 118.315, 118.365, 118.367, and 118.770 to include political organization or political group candidates as candidates required to file nomination papers for a regular election; amend KRS 118.375 to change from 106 days to three months as the minimum amount of time that certain candidates may file petitions for a vacant elective office; amend KRS 118.760 to state the procedures to be followed for the nomination of independent, political organization, or political group candidates for a special election; amend KRS 118A.100 to establish petition standards for candidates for an unexpired term of a judicial office; amend KRS 118A.190 to establish for the board of elections of each county a certification deadline to the Secretary of State following primary or regular election.
Title
AN ACT relating to elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 123) | |
2010-04-01 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-04-01 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2010-04-01 | received in House | |
2010-03-29 | passed 35-0 | |
2010-03-29 | Senate receded from Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-29 | posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-29 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-29 | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-26 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute for Monday, March 29, 2010 | |
2010-03-19 | to Rules (H) | |
2010-03-19 | received in House | |
2010-03-18 | 3rd reading, passed 22-15 with Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-17 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 18, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-10 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-02-16 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-02-11 | received in Senate | |
2010-02-10 | 3rd reading, passed 98-1 | |
2010-02-03 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 10, 2010 | |
2010-02-03 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-02 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-01-12 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-05 | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB97.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB97/bill.doc |