KY HB96 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-04 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 141.019 to exclude all distributions from military pension plans received by retired members of the United States military and their surviving spouses or former spouse under a survivor benefit plan from income taxation for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2022, and before January 1, 2026; require reporting by the Department of Revenue; amend KRS 131.190 to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to an exemption of income taxation for military pensions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-04Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2022-01-04Houseintroduced in House
2021-12-02HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback