KY HB96 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 128)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 15.310 to include definitions of "certified fire investigator" and "fire investigator"; amend KRS 15.334 to require the Kentucky Law Enforcement Council to promulgate administrative regulations to establish a course of training for fire investigators; amend KRS 15.380 to require the Kentucky Law Enforcement Council to certify fire investigators; create a new section of KRS 15.380 to 15.404 to list the minimum qualifications of a fire investigator; amend KRS 15.383 to require a certified fire investigator to annually meet marksmanship qualifications; create a new section of KRS 15.380 to 15.404 to allow the Kentucky Law Enforcement Council to revoke a fire investigator's certification; create a new section of KRS 15.380 to 15.404 to require a fire investigator to complete training of at least 275 hours; create a new section of KRS 15.380 to 15.404 to establish certification categories for fire investigators; amend KRS 15.388 to require the fire chief to notify the Kentucky Law Enforcement Council that the employee meets the precertification qualifications of a fire investigator; amend KRS 15.442 to specify that a fire investigator is not eligible to participate in the Kentucky Law Enforcement Foundation Program fund; and create a new section of KRS Chapter 95A to define "fire investigator," and provide that the chief of a fire department may appoint a professional firefighter to be a fire investigator; amend KRS 15.382 to conform; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the investigation of fire related crimes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 667 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 259 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 128)
2018-03-29Housedelivered to Governor
2018-03-29Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-03-29Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-03-29Housereceived in House
2018-03-29Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2018-03-27Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 29, 2018
2018-03-22Senatereported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill
2018-03-21Senatereturned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2018-03-21Senate2nd reading
2018-03-21Senatetaken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2018-03-20Senatereturned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2018-03-20Senate1st reading
2018-03-20Senatetaken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2018-03-13Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2018-03-12Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-09House3rd reading, passed 84-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-03-08Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 9, 2018
2018-03-06Housereported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill
2018-03-01Houseposted in committee
2018-02-08Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-02-08House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-07Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-02-02Houseposted in committee
2018-01-04Houseto Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H)
2018-01-02Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback