KY HB95 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-10 - to Local Government (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-10 - to Local Government (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 160.280 to increase the allowed per diem for members of local boards of education from $75 to $150; increase the total annual maximum of per diem and reimbursed expenses from $3,000 to $6,000; EFFECTIVE July 1, 2019.
Title
AN ACT relating to members of boards of education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-10 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2019-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
2018-12-12 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/hb95.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/hb95/orig_bill.pdf |