KY HB95 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - returned to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - returned to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 26A to allow state court judges who adhere to the requirements of the Criminal Justice Information Services to access the National Crime Information Center (NCIC).
Title
AN ACT relating to criminal history record checks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-03 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2017-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017 |
2017-03-02 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-01 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2017-02-27 | House | posted in committee |
2017-01-03 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2017-01-03 | House | introduced in House |
2016-12-08 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |