KY HB95 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 126)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #7) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 126)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #7) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to require the Department for Medicaid Services to submit a waiver or waiver amendment to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services in order to provide coverage for home telemonitoring services and direct-to-patient telehealth services; define terms; amend KRS 273.443 to permit community action agencies to use federal funds to ensure adequate access to health care; create a new section of KRS 273.410 to 273.453 to require the state administering agency to establish a program to permit telehealth consultation services and require Medicaid coverage; and amend KRS 205.559 to permit state administering agencies to receive Medicaid reimbursement for telehealth consultation services.
Title
AN ACT relating to telehealth services.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Burch [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] | Rep. George Brown [D] | Rep. Mary Marzian [D] |
Rep. David Watkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 126) |
2016-04-01 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-04-01 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-04-01 | House | passed 82-0 |
2016-04-01 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitutes (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-04-01 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitutes (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-04-01 | House | to Rules (H) |
2016-04-01 | House | received in House |
2016-04-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, April 1, 2016 |
2016-04-01 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2016-03-29 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitutes (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | 1st reading |
2016-03-28 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-18 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (5) |
2016-03-14 | House | floor amendment (5) filed to Committee Substitute |
2016-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 11, 2016 |
2016-03-04 | House | floor amendments (1) and (4) filed to Bill, (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2016-03-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-01-06 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-05 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2016-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
2015-11-30 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |