KY HB94 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - posted in committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - posted in committee
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 431.066 to provide that financial bail be solely imposed for ensuring a defendant's appearance; require a detention hearing for any defendant determined by the court to be a danger to the public if released; create a new section of KRS Chapter 431 to establish a detention hearing process; amend KRS 27A.360, 218A.135, 222.204, 431.520, 431.525, 431.530, 431.535, 431.540, 452.260, and 431.510 to conform; repeal KRS 431.021; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2020.
Title
AN ACT relating to pretrial release.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | posted in committee |
2019-01-10 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2019-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
2018-12-12 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Bail and Pretrial Release
Corrections Impact
Courts
Courts, Circuit
Courts, District
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Effective Dates, Delayed
Local Mandate
Corrections Impact
Courts
Courts, Circuit
Courts, District
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Effective Dates, Delayed
Local Mandate