KY HB93 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 162.065 to require the Kentucky Board of Education to include "construction management-at-risk" as a project delivery method option for school construction projects.
Title
AN ACT relating to school construction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 212 (Y: 48 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 48-41 |
2020-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-30 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to Education (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-11-12 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |