KY HB93 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 146 to establish an endangered and threatened plant species list to be maintained by the Kentucky State Nature Preserves commission; prohibit the taking or possession of an endangered and threatened plant species without written permission of the owner, lessee, or other person entitled to possession; authorize the Kentucky State Nature Preserves Commission to promulgate regulations to establish a list, regulate the sale, the protection, and the taking of the plant species and exempt taking of species for certain purposes and circumstances; require persons that sell endangered or threatened plant species to be registered with the commission; require certification of propagators; require inspection of nurseries and propagators if the facility sells or propagates endangered or threatened species; require state agencies to avoid activities that will jeopardize the existence of an endangered or threatened species; exempt location of endangered and threatened species from Open Records Act; amend KRS 146.605 to create definitions; amend KRS 146.990 to create a civil penalty of $500 per violation per day for as long as offense continues and allow State Nature Preserves Commission to stop the person from continuing the activity.
Title
AN ACT relating to rare plant protection.
Sponsors
Rep. James Kay [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | to Rules (H) |
2015-03-23 | House | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-03-03 | House | floor amendment (7) filed to Committee Substitute |
2015-03-02 | House | floor amendment (5) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (6-title) filed |
2015-02-23 | House | floor amendment (4) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (3) filed |
2015-02-13 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2) filed to the bill |
2015-02-05 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2015-02-05 | House | taken from Rules |
2015-02-05 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-04 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-03 | House | posting waived |
2015-01-06 | House | to Agriculture & Small Business (H) |
2015-01-06 | House | introduced in House |