KY HB93 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-14 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-14 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 218A.420, regarding the disposition of forfeited property, to clarify that any vehicle forfeited which is contaminated with methamphetamine shall not be used, resold, or salvaged for parts, but shall instead be destroyed or salvaged for scrap metal.
Title
AN ACT relating to the disposal of vehicles forfeited to law enforcement agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | received in House |
2014-04-14 | Senate | passed 36-2 with Committee Substitute (2), committee amendment (2-title) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | committee amendment (1-title) withdrawn |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Committee Substitute (1) withdrawn |
2014-04-14 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2014-04-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, April 14, 2014 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2), committee amendment (2-title) as a Consent Bill |
2014-04-14 | Senate | recommitted to Transportation (S) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | taken from Rules (S) |
2014-03-27 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2014-02-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-02-06 | House | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 with Committee Substitute |
2014-02-05 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 6, 2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-04 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-01-30 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-07 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2014-01-07 | House | introduced in House |