KY HB92 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - to Education (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - to Education (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 160.107 to allow a waiver or modification of the statewide assessment system for schools participating in a district of innovation plan, under specific conditions; allow a district of innovation to use student assessments other than those required by the state board, under specific conditions.
Title
AN ACT relating to districts of innovation.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Clark [D] | Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. George Brown [D] | Rep. John Carney [R] |
Rep. Dennis Horlander [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-02-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 |
2016-02-03 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 5 |
2016-02-03 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-02 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-01-28 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-05 | House | to Education (H) |
2016-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
2015-11-24 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |