KY HB89 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-05 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 518 to create the crime of intimidation of a sports official as a Class A misdemeanor.
Title
AN ACT relating to intimidation of a sports official.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Bridges [R] | Rep. David Hale [R] | Rep. Danny Bentley [R] | Rep. Richard Heath [R] |
Rep. Derek Lewis [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] | Rep. Chad McCoy [R] | Rep. Brandon Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 57 (Y: 78 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 78-9 |
2021-02-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 9, 2021 |
2021-02-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2021-01-13 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
2020-11-16 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |