KY HB89 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - recommitted to Health & Welfare (H)
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - recommitted to Health & Welfare (H)
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 156.160 to require that preventative health care examination forms include a measure of body mass index; permit the Department of Education to share aggregate data from the forms by school district or county with the Cabinet for Health and Family Services.
Title
AN ACT relating to the inclusion of the body mass index on school physical examination forms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | recommitted to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2011-02-17 | floor amendments (2) and (3-title) filed | |
2011-02-16 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-16 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2011-02-15 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2011-02-11 | posted in committee | |
2011-01-04 | to Education (H) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB89.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB89/bill.doc |