KY HB87 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 128)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 128)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 159.035 to allow for any high school student participating in basic training required by a branch of the United States Armed Forces to be considered present for all purposes for up to ten days.
Title
AN ACT relating to military service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 128) |
2016-04-01 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-04-01 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-04-01 | House | received in House |
2016-04-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2016-04-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, April 1, 2016 (Consent Orders #2) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2016-03-28 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | 1st reading |
2016-03-28 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2016-03-03 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 4, 2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-01 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-02-26 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-05 | House | to Education (H) |
2016-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
2015-11-16 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |