KY HB86 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 387 to enact the Uniform Adult Guardianship and Protective Proceedings Jurisdiction Act, as recommended to the states by the National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State laws, to govern jurisdictional questions and disputes between states in regard to cases concerning guardians and conservators; amend KRS 387.520 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Uniform Adult Guardianship and Protective Proceedings Jurisdiction Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Jesse Crenshaw [D] | Rep. Kelly Flood [D] | Rep. Mary Marzian [D] |
Rep. Reginald Meeks [D] | Rep. Darryl Owens [D] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2010-02-11 | received in Senate | |
2010-02-10 | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 | |
2010-02-04 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 10, 2010 | |
2010-02-04 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-03 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-02-01 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-05 | to Judiciary (H) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB86.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB86/bill.doc |