KY HB84 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 25-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 105)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 367.46955 to prohibit telephone solicitations which misrepresent the name or telephone number in caller identification services; amend KRS 367.46999 to increase the fines for second offenses and clarify enforcement mechanisms; amend KRS 367.667 to prohibit charitable telephone solicitations which misrepresent the name or telephone number in caller identification services; amend KRS 367.990 to add criminal fines and the payment of restitution for violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to caller identification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 322 (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa 1 RSN# 944 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 105 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 105)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-13Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-13Housepassed 94-2
2019-03-13HouseHouse concurred in Senate floor amendment (1)
2019-03-13Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendment (1)
2019-03-13Housetaken from Rules
2019-03-12Houseto Rules (H)
2019-03-12Housereceived in House
2019-03-12Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0 with floor amendment (1)
2019-03-12Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2019-03-07Senatefloor amendment (1) filed
2019-03-07Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-06Senatereturned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-03-06Senate1st reading
2019-03-06Senatetaken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-02-27Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-02-25Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-22House3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-21Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019
2019-02-21House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-20Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-15Houseposted in committee
2019-01-10Houseto Judiciary (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House
2018-11-28HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback