KY HB8 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 23-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 110)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 205 to define terms; establish the Medicaid ground ambulance service provider assessment; require ground ambulance service providers to pay a Medicaid ambulance service provider assessment quarterly; authorize the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to promulgate administrative regulations necessary to implement the Medicaid ground ambulance service provider assessment; create the ambulance service assessment revenue fund; APPROPRIATION.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to ground ambulance service providers and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1441 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 154 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-24Housesigned by Governor (Acts Ch. 110)
2020-04-14Housedelivered to Governor
2020-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-04-14Housereceived in House
2020-04-14Senate3rd reading, passed 34-0
2020-04-14Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, April 14, 2020
2020-03-26Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-19Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2020-03-02Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2020-02-28Senatereceived in Senate
2020-02-27House3rd reading, passed 91-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-02-26Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 27, 2020
2020-02-25Housereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-01-24Houseposted in committee
2020-01-22Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2020-01-17House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-01-16Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-01-13Houseposted in committee
2020-01-07Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2020-01-07Houseintroduced in House
2019-05-09HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback