KY HB79 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-10)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 128)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-10)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 128)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 15.518 to include telecommunicators as eligible participants in the Law Enforcement Professional Development and Wellness Program; amend KRS 15.550 to require the telecommunicator basic course training to include instruction on and provide resources for treatment of post-traumatic stress disorder and work-induced stress, require the Kentucky Law Enforcement Council to incorporate PTSD mental health treatment into the telecommunicator training program and provide treatment resources to telecommunicators and their supervisors; amend KRS 15.560 and 15.565 to require each in-service training to include a mental health component on PTSD and work-induced stress; amend KRS 15.590 to require the Kentucky Law Enforcement Council to include training and resources for post-traumatic stress disorder and work-induced stress during each telecommunicator in-service training, provide guidelines and a resource list to all telecommunicators and their supervisors, and allow telecommunicators to access the Law Enforcement Professional Development and Wellness Program; this Act shall be known as the Lifeliner's Act.
Title
AN ACT relating to mental health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2272 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 171 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 171 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 128) |
2022-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-29 | House | received in House |
2022-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2022-03-24 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2022-03-23 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2022-03-22 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2022-03-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2022-03-03 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2022-02-15 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 16, 2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | reported favorably, to Rules |
2022-01-13 | House | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2022-01-13 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-01-12 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2022-01-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-01-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-08 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | introduced in House |
2021-10-22 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Fiscal Note
Mental Health
Occupational Safety and Health
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Police, State
Public Officers and Employees
Public Safety
Short Titles and Popular Names
Telecommunications
Mental Health
Occupational Safety and Health
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Police, State
Public Officers and Employees
Public Safety
Short Titles and Popular Names
Telecommunications