KY HB752 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 154)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 154)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from the EKSAFE and WKSAFE funds for continuing recovery in eastern and western Kentucky; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to disaster recovery, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 421 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3169 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 340 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3169 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 340 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 154) |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | passed with 97-0 Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-28 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-28 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-28 | House | taken from Rules |
2024-03-28 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2024 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2024-03-27 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 89-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-03-25 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-25 | House | taken from Rules |
2024-03-25 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-02-29 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-02-29 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-29 | House | 2nd reading |
2024-02-29 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-28 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-28 | House | 1st reading |
2024-02-28 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | introduced in House |