KY HB75 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-03 - returned to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-03 - returned to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 342.650, concerning exemptions from workers' compensation, to include lawn services as well as maintenance, repair, remodeling, or similar work for not more than 20 days on a private home or on the premises of a business that employs no other workers subject to workers' compensation laws.
Title
AN ACT relating to exemptions from workers' compensation coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | Senate | returned to Agriculture (S) |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-03-03 | Senate | taken from Agriculture (S) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | reassigned to Agriculture (S) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 88-8 with floor amendment (2) |
2017-02-15 | House | floor amendment (2) filed |
2017-02-14 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2017-02-13 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 14, 2017 |
2017-02-10 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-09 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-08 | House | posted in committee |
2017-01-03 | House | to Small Business & Information Technology (H) |
2017-01-03 | House | introduced in House |
2016-11-17 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |